NJ A3908 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"COVID-19 Financial Security for Consumers Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"COVID-19 Financial Security for Consumers Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-05-01AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
2020-04-09AssemblyIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

S2330 (Same As) 2020-05-14 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Pou)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback