NJ A3899 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A347
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits surgical declawing of cats and other animals.
Title
Prohibits surgical declawing of cats and other animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (42-10-12) |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3899 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2410 (Same As) 2016-06-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2410 (Same As) 2016-06-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee