NJ A3894 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5687
Note: Carry Over of previous S4059
Note: Carry Over of previous S4059
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits voters to sign backup paper polling record in counties opting to use e-poll books.
Title
Permits voters to sign backup paper polling record in counties opting to use e-poll books.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5687 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2538 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S4059 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2538 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S4059 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3894 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3894_I1.HTM |