NJ A3891 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3589
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates new level of barbering license and apprenticeships in barbering, and establishes limits to hours of instruction for certain barbering training.
Title
Creates new level of barbering license and apprenticeships in barbering, and establishes limits to hours of instruction for certain barbering training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1810 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3589 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3589 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee