NJ A3891 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates certain assistance programs for businesses owned by lesbian, gay, bisexual, or transgender persons, by persons with a disability, and by veterans.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates certain assistance programs for businesses owned by lesbian, gay, bisexual, or transgender persons, by persons with a disability, and by veterans.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3247 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-05SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-1)
2018-01-05SenateSubstituted for S3247
2017-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2017-05-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (50-14-10)
2017-02-13AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2017-02-13AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Human Services Committee
2016-06-06AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3247 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A3891 (ACS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback