NJ A3821 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A317

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires electric public utilities to install smart meters and associated infrastructure at the request of customer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires electric public utilities to install smart meters and associated infrastructure at the request of customer.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21AssemblyWithdrawn from Consideration
2018-04-12AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S54 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A317 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback