NJ A3771 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Substituted by S1603 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Substituted by S1603 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes restriction on receipt of retirement annuities by certain members of JRS who file for deferred retirement.
Title
Removes restriction on receipt of retirement annuities by certain members of JRS who file for deferred retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Substituted by S1603 (1R) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1603 (Same As) 2022-08-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.94.