NJ A3769 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOH to license certain qualifying hospitals to provide full service adult diagnostic cardiac catheterization, primary angioplasty, and elective angioplasty services.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DOH to license certain qualifying hospitals to provide full service adult diagnostic cardiac catheterization, primary angioplasty, and elective angioplasty services.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (68-4-5)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-04-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2427 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback