NJ A3747 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1854
Note: Carry Over of previous S726
Note: Carry Over of previous S726
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes innovation zone program to stimulate technology industry clusters around New Jersey's research institutions; allows certain technology businesses located in certain innovation zones to receive certain tax credits under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.
Title
Establishes innovation zone program to stimulate technology industry clusters around New Jersey's research institutions; allows certain technology businesses located in certain innovation zones to receive certain tax credits under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] |
Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3747 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1322 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S726 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S1322 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S726 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session