NJ A3711 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Substituted by S2460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Substituted by S2460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Partially repeals prohibitions, permits, licenses, and authorizations concerning wagers on professional, collegiate or amateur sport contests or athletic events.*
Title
Partially repeals prohibitions, permits, licenses, and authorizations concerning wagers on professional, collegiate or amateur sport contests or athletic events.*
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S2460 |
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Caputo) |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2460 (Same As) 2014-10-17 - Approved P.L.2015, c.62.