NJ A3688 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-20-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-20-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Agriculture to implement mobile fresh produce markets for residents of urban "food desert" communities. *
Title
Authorizes Department of Agriculture to implement mobile fresh produce markets for residents of urban "food desert" communities. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-05 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-20-4) | |
2011-11-10 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-09-26 | Passed by the Senate (37-0) | |
2011-09-26 | Substituted for S2728 (1R) | |
2011-08-25 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-05-19 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Passed by the Assembly (63-12-2) | |
2011-01-24 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2728 (Same As) 2011-09-26 - Substituted by A3688 (2R)