NJ A3685 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4245
Note: Carry Over of previous A5802
Note: Carry Over of previous A5802
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program in Office of Planning Advocacy to reimburse municipalities for certain expenditures concerning warehouse development; appropriates $1 million.
Title
Establishes pilot program in Office of Planning Advocacy to reimburse municipalities for certain expenditures concerning warehouse development; appropriates $1 million.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Alex Sauickie [R] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Heather Simmons [D] |
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Shama Haider [D] | Rep. William Spearman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1077 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S4245 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5802 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S4245 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5802 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3685 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3685_I1.HTM |