NJ A3619 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Hearing: Dec 9 @ 7:00 pm in The State House Annex has reopened to the general public. Visito
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows commercial farmer to be awarded reasonable costs and attorney fees for defending against bad faith complaints under "Right to Farm Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows commercial farmer to be awarded reasonable costs and attorney fees for defending against bad faith complaints under "Right to Farm Act".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2021-05-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-1)
2021-02-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-03-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3838 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback