NJ A3616 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes performance and training standards for certain Medicaid transportation services and requires DHS to report compliance with standards.
Title
Establishes performance and training standards for certain Medicaid transportation services and requires DHS to report compliance with standards.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] |
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-2) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2317 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee