NJ A3612 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Jake's Law; Incentivizes counties to design and construct completely inclusive playgrounds as a priority for State funding for recreational and conservation purposes.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jake's Law; Incentivizes counties to design and construct completely inclusive playgrounds as a priority for State funding for recreational and conservation purposes.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-0-3)
2016-10-20AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)
2016-10-07AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Greenwald)
2016-06-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-04-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2118 (Same As) 2017-12-04 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback