NJ A3606 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A162
Note: Carry Foward to future S824
Note: Carry Over of previous A6068
Note: Carry Over of previous S4111
Note: Carry Foward to future S824
Note: Carry Over of previous A6068
Note: Carry Over of previous S4111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
Pending: Assembly Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
Pending: Assembly Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows possession of bear spray under certain conditions.
Title
Allows possession of bear spray under certain conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3606 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
A3606 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S1770 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A6068 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S4111 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3606 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S1770 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A6068 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S4111 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A3606 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A4000/3606_I1.HTM |