NJ A3568 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4017
Note: Carry Over of previous A5689
Note: Carry Over of previous A5689
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows persons who qualify under Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program to become law enforcement and corrections officers.
Title
Allows persons who qualify under Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program to become law enforcement and corrections officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2439 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S4017 (Carry Over) 2023-06-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5689 (Carry Over) 2023-11-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S4017 (Carry Over) 2023-06-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5689 (Carry Over) 2023-11-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3568 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3568_I1.HTM |