NJ A3565 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A667
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-20 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-20 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain individuals to drive Type S school buses.
Title
Authorizes certain individuals to drive Type S school buses.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Kean [R] | Rep. Edward Thomson [R] | Rep. Gregory McGuckin [R] | Rep. John Catalano [R] |
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3565 (Carry Over) 2022-06-20 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S2152 (Same As) 2022-06-09 - Combined with S1682 (SCS)
S2152 (Same As) 2022-06-09 - Combined with S1682 (SCS)