NJ A3559 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires training program for school bus drivers and aides on interacting with students with special needs.
Title
Requires training program for school bus drivers and aides on interacting with students with special needs.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Concetta Wagner [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2418 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2418 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2418 |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2013-12-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2418 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3559