NJ A355 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3191
Note: Carry Foward to future S2572
Note: Carry Over of previous A4492
Note: Carry Over of previous S2762
Note: Carry Foward to future S2572
Note: Carry Over of previous A4492
Note: Carry Over of previous S2762
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes fund to reimburse municipalities for police and sanitation costs related to crowding at MVC sites; appropriates $500,000.
Title
Establishes fund to reimburse municipalities for police and sanitation costs related to crowding at MVC sites; appropriates $500,000.
Sponsors
Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A355 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A355 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4492 (Carry Over) 2020-08-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2762 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2112 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A355 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4492 (Carry Over) 2020-08-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2762 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2112 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A355 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A0500/355_I1.HTM |