NJ A3489 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by S1131
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-21 - Substituted by S1131 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-21 - Substituted by S1131 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for notification of emergency contact in event of death of senior citizen in senior citizen housing facility.
Title
Provides for notification of emergency contact in event of death of senior citizen in senior citizen housing facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S1131 (2R) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1131 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.5.
S1131 (Replaced by) 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.5.
S1131 (Replaced by) 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.5.