NJ A3488 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A726
Note: Carry Foward to future S174
Note: Carry Over of previous A3405
Note: Carry Over of previous S1460
Note: Carry Foward to future S174
Note: Carry Over of previous A3405
Note: Carry Over of previous S1460
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes forest firefighter death benefit.
Title
Establishes forest firefighter death benefit.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Rumpf [R] | Rep. DiAnne Gove [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3488 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3488 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1371 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3405 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1460 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3488 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1371 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3405 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1460 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3488 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3488_I1.HTM |