NJ A3456 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2273
Note: Carry Over of previous S1342
Note: Carry Over of previous S1342
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-01-23 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-01-23 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces allowed diversion of funds from stormwater, water, and sewer purposes to municipal and county budgets; requires municipalities and counties to notify Division of Local Government Services of diversions.
Title
Reduces allowed diversion of funds from stormwater, water, and sewer purposes to municipal and county budgets; requires municipalities and counties to notify Division of Local Government Services of diversions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2025-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-23 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2307 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2273 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S1342 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2273 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S1342 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee