NJ A3413 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5877
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Substituted by S2082 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Substituted by S2082 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Educator Evaluation Review Task Force; clarifies collection of student growth data.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Educator Evaluation Review Task Force; clarifies collection of student growth data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Substituted by S2082 (SCS/1R) |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2082 (Same As) 2024-04-11 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A5877 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (63-11-0)
A5877 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (63-11-0)