NJ A3406 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes teen driver orientation program.
Title
Establishes teen driver orientation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2017-07-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (47-19-2) |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2336 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee