NJ A3370 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4427
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S3191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S3191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends voting rights of representatives of sending districts on receiving district board of education.
Title
Extends voting rights of representatives of sending districts on receiving district board of education.
Sponsors
Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Rep. Gail Phoebus [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted by S3191 |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4427 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3191 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.140.
S3191 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.140.