NJ A3350 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-10 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-10 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows licensing authorities to grant a license to certain child support obligors under certain circumstances.*
Title
Allows licensing authorities to grant a license to certain child support obligors under certain circumstances.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-10 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) | |
2010-12-09 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-06 | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee | |
2010-10-07 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2497 (Same As) 2010-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee