NJ A3288 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1613
Note: Carry Foward to future A3886
Note: Carry Foward to future A3886
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Blockchain Promotion and Integration Program.
Title
Establishes Blockchain Promotion and Integration Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Ellen Park [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] |
Rep. Linda Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2022-10-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2022-10-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-15 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3288 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3288 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3142 (Same As) 2023-12-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3288 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3142 (Same As) 2023-12-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee