NJ A327 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4514

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Regulates the authority of the court to make provision for the educational expenses of an unemancipated child in certain instances involving child support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulates the authority of the court to make provision for the educational expenses of an unemancipated child in certain instances involving child support.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4514 (Carry Over) 2015-06-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S813 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback