NJ A326 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4440

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKeon)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires municipalities to share certain payments received in lieu of property taxes with school districts; informs counties and school districts of application for property tax exemption.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires municipalities to share certain payments received in lieu of property taxes with school districts; informs counties and school districts of application for property tax exemption.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-26AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKeon)
2016-03-07AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4440 (Carry Over) 2015-05-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback