NJ A3257 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2774
Note: Carry Foward to future A7774
Note: Carry Over of previous A1512
Note: Carry Over of previous S2088
Note: Carry Foward to future A7774
Note: Carry Over of previous A1512
Note: Carry Over of previous S2088
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits wineries to operate salesrooms in certain municipalities with restrictions on the sale of alcoholic beverages.
Title
Permits wineries to operate salesrooms in certain municipalities with restrictions on the sale of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3257 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A3257 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A1512 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2065 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2088 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3257 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A1512 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2065 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2088 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3257 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3257_I1.HTM |