NJ A3249 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1226
Note: Carry Over of previous S584
Note: Carry Over of previous A2322
Note: Carry Over of previous S584
Note: Carry Over of previous A2322
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
Pending: Assembly Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
Pending: Assembly Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands school breakfast program to all schools with five percent or more of students eligible for free or reduced price meals.
Title
Expands school breakfast program to all schools with five percent or more of students eligible for free or reduced price meals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3249 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S1343 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S584 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A2322 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1343 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S584 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A2322 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A3249 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3500/3249_I1.HTM |