NJ A3231 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3046
Note: Carry Over of previous A3133
Note: Carry Over of previous A3133
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes trunk fighting as animal cruelty offense and crime of the third degree.
Title
Establishes trunk fighting as animal cruelty offense and crime of the third degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S975 |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S975 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.83.
S3046 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3133 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S3046 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3133 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee