NJ A3131 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires landlords to provide receipts for cash payments from tenants.
Title
Requires landlords to provide receipts for cash payments from tenants.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (65-5-2) |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5290 (Carry Over) 2017-12-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S2142 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2142 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee