NJ A313 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1823
Note: Carry Foward to future A3408
Note: Carry Over of previous A3224
Note: Carry Foward to future A3408
Note: Carry Over of previous A3224
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain additional school district personnel to complete training program on suicide prevention.
Title
Requires certain additional school district personnel to complete training program on suicide prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-1) |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A313 (Carry Over) 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A313 (Carry Over) 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3224 (Carry Over) 2015-02-23 - Assembly Substitution (Singleton)
S2015 (Same As) 2016-04-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A313 (Carry Over) 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3224 (Carry Over) 2015-02-23 - Assembly Substitution (Singleton)
S2015 (Same As) 2016-04-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A313 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/313_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A313 |