NJ A312 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A600
Note: Carry Over of previous S3887
Note: Carry Over of previous S3887
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public utility from terminating service for nonpayment unless customer is provided certified letter at least 10 business days prior to scheduled termination date.
Title
Prohibits public utility from terminating service for nonpayment unless customer is provided certified letter at least 10 business days prior to scheduled termination date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A600 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3887 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3887 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A312 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/312_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A312 |