NJ A3116 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3939
Note: Carry Over of previous S1325
Note: Carry Over of previous S1325
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits rescheduling, cancellation, and no-show fees providers of health care services may charge in certain instances.
Title
Limits rescheduling, cancellation, and no-show fees providers of health care services may charge in certain instances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1511 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3939 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1325 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3939 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1325 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3116 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3116_I1.HTM |