NJ A3105 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-11)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-11)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that limitation on hours of retail sale of alcohol be consistent throughout licensed premises.
Title
Provides that limitation on hours of retail sale of alcohol be consistent throughout licensed premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3004 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3004 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-11) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Substituted for S3004 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (53-9-7) |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | INT 1RA REF ARO |
Same As/Similar To
S3004 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A3105