NJ A3096 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-14-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2129 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs certain unclaimed electric and gas utility deposits in Unclaimed Utility Deposits Trust Fund and societal charge revenues to be paid to Statewide nonprofit energy assistance organizations meeting certain eligibility criteria.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs certain unclaimed electric and gas utility deposits in Unclaimed Utility Deposits Trust Fund and societal charge revenues to be paid to Statewide nonprofit energy assistance organizations meeting certain eligibility criteria.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-20 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31AssemblySubstituted by S2129 (SCS/1R)
2019-01-28AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-09-24AssemblyReported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-02-08AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2129 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback