NJ A3070 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A196
Note: Carry Over of previous S2406
Note: Carry Over of previous S2406
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State entities to recycle certain materials and provide recycling bins in State buildings.
Title
Requires State entities to recycle certain materials and provide recycling bins in State buildings.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Guardian [R] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] |
Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Gregory McGuckin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A196 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S2406 (Carry Over) 2022-11-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2690 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2406 (Carry Over) 2022-11-03 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2690 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3070 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3500/3070_I1.HTM |