NJ A3062 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S1998/2119 (SCS/3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S1998/2119 (SCS/3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain provisions of New Jersey Prescription Monitoring Program.***
Title
Revises certain provisions of New Jersey Prescription Monitoring Program.***
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Substituted by S1998/2119 (SCS/3R) |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2119 (Same As) 2014-12-15 - Combined with S1998 (SCS)
S1998 (Same As) 2015-07-18 - Approved P.L.2015, c.74.
S1998 (Same As) 2015-07-18 - Approved P.L.2015, c.74.