NJ A305 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2266
Note: Carry Foward to future S2937
Note: Carry Over of previous A2183
Note: Carry Foward to future S2937
Note: Carry Over of previous A2183
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The New Jersey Battlefield to Boardroom Act; Provides corporation business tax credits and gross income tax credits for qualified wages of certain veterans.
Title
The New Jersey Battlefield to Boardroom Act; Provides corporation business tax credits and gross income tax credits for qualified wages of certain veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A305 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A305 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2183 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2653 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A305 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2183 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2653 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee