NJ A3040 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns hospital asset transformation program.
Title
Concerns hospital asset transformation program.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. John Wisniewski [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Robert Clifton [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (46-27-4) |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2003 (Same As) 2012-05-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee