NJ A2986 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2826

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-15 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes COAH to credit municipalities with 1.5 units of fair share affordable housing obligation for each unit of transitional housing occupied by a veteran.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes COAH to credit municipalities with 1.5 units of fair share affordable housing obligation for each unit of transitional housing occupied by a veteran.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-15AssemblyWithdrawn from Consideration
2018-02-08AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1088 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2826 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback