NJ A2985 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2110

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-15 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes COAH to credit municipalities with 1.5 units of fair share affordable housing obligation for each housing unit occupied by a veteran; permits municipalities to satisfy fair share affordable housing obligation through 35 percent set aside for veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes COAH to credit municipalities with 1.5 units of fair share affordable housing obligation for each housing unit occupied by a veteran; permits municipalities to satisfy fair share affordable housing obligation through 35 percent set aside for veterans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-15AssemblyWithdrawn from Consideration
2018-02-08AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1104 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2110 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback