NJ A2977 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2022
Note: Carry Over of previous A4163
Note: Carry Over of previous A4163
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law concerning foreign country money-judgment recognition.
Title
Revises law concerning foreign country money-judgment recognition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2268 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S2268 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2977 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
A4163 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2268 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A2977
A4163 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2268 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A2977