NJ A2971 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A304
Note: Carry Over of previous A3612
Note: Carry Over of previous A3612
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that corporate directors may approve actions without a meeting by electronic transmission.
Title
Clarifies that corporate directors may approve actions without a meeting by electronic transmission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2235 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Substituted for S2235 |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (64-0-0) |
2017-11-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2971 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
A3612 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2235 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A2971
A3612 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2235 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A2971