NJ A2963 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Substituted by S1990
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Substituted by S1990
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows member of Board of Public Utilities to serve in unsalaried State government office.
Title
Allows member of Board of Public Utilities to serve in unsalaried State government office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Substituted by S1990 |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S1783 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
S1990 (Same As) 2020-06-11 - Approved P.L.2020, c.36.
S1990 (Same As) 2020-06-11 - Approved P.L.2020, c.36.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2963 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2963_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2963_R1.HTM |