NJ A292 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2631
Note: Carry Foward to future S1933
Note: Carry Over of previous A4019
Note: Carry Over of previous S1277
Note: Carry Foward to future S1933
Note: Carry Over of previous A4019
Note: Carry Over of previous S1277
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides limited civil liability immunity to farmers hosting agritourism activities.
Title
Provides limited civil liability immunity to farmers hosting agritourism activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. John Armato [D] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A292 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A292 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A4019 (Carry Over) 2018-05-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1835 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1277 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A292 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A4019 (Carry Over) 2018-05-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1835 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1277 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A292 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/292_I1.HTM |