NJ A2895 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by S2078
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-28 - Substituted by S2078
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-28 - Substituted by S2078
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes grant program to provide rebate of sales and use tax paid for purchase of certain materials and supplies used for construction of certain off-track wagering facilities.*
Title
Establishes grant program to provide rebate of sales and use tax paid for purchase of certain materials and supplies used for construction of certain off-track wagering facilities.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Reconsidered Vote (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Assembly | Substituted by S2078 |
2012-06-28 | Assembly | Reconsidered Vote (75-0-3) (Burzichelli) |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-2) |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1818 (Same As) 2012-06-07 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2078 (Replaced by) 2012-08-07 - Approved P.L.2012, c.40.
S2078 (Replaced by) 2012-08-07 - Approved P.L.2012, c.40.